Abstract |
After graduating from LSU in 1941, Captain Robert G. Black entered the United States Navy Reserve Midshipmen's School, or the Navy College Training Program, V-7. Captain Black discusses his service on submarine patrols in the Pacific during World War II on the USS Flying Fish SS-229, USS Batfish SS-310, and USS Guittaro SS-363. Captain Black further discusses his post war Naval career on the USS Clamagore SS-343 1946-1949, CO of the Flying Fish in 1951, CO of the USS Sablefish SS-303 in 1952, head of the Enlisted School of Instructors at the Bureau of Naval Personnel 1923-1955, Commander Submarine Force Atlantic Fleet 1955-1957, command of Submarine Division 102 1957-1959, CINCNELM US NAVEUR staff for duty as the submarine warfare advisor 1959-1963, CO of the USS Hunley AS-31 1963-1965, command of Submarine Squadron 4 1965-1966, director of Personnel Research at the Bureau of Naval Personnel 1966-1969, Commander of U.S. Naval Station in San Juan, Puerto Rico 1969-1971, retired in May 1972. |
General note | Interviewer: H. A. I. Sugg. Interview dates: May 10, 1999 and November 9, 1999. |
Access restriction | No access restrictions. |
Cite as |
Robert G. Black Oral History Interview (#OH0179), East Carolina Manuscript Collection, J. Y. Joyner Library, East Carolina University, Greenville, North Carolina, USA. |
Terms of use | Repository does not own copyright to the oral history collection. Permission to cite, reproduce, or broadcast must be obtained from both the repository and the participants in the oral history, or their heirs. |
Acquisitions source |
Joyner- Gift of Robert G. Black. |
Biographical note | Robert G. Black, Sr., (October 22, 1917-July 8, 2008) from Gallatin, Missouri, attended the University of Tulsa (1936-1938), and then Louisiana State University where he graduated in June 1941 with a B.S. degree in Petroleum Geology. He immediately entered the U.S. Navy and was commissioned in the United States Naval Reserve. He attended Midshipman School, Northwestern University, and graduated in 1941. He served aboard submarines in the Pacific during the Second World War. After the war he remained with submarines and was assigned as commander of the U.S. Navy's first nuclear submarine division (Division 102) in 1957 and later served in various positions in charge of personnel. Black earned his M.S. degree in International Affairs from George Washington University in 1966 and assumed command of the U.S. naval station in San Juan, Puerto Rico (1969-1971). He was awarded several decorations and medals for his service in the Second World War such as silver, gold, and bronze stars, and campaign, defense, service, and victory medals. Black also received a Meritorious Service Medal for service as director of the Personnel Research Division of the Bureau of Naval Personnel (1966-1969). He is married to Jane Forbes of Greenville, N.C., and has one son, Robert G. Black, Jr. He retired from the Navy in 1972, and then worked for Data-Design Laboratories for almost twelve years before retiring a second time in 1984 and settling in Greenville, N.C. |